Weekes, Darlene Angele (CPSO#: 84990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Maryland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Department of Anesthesiology
401 Smyth Rd, room 3348
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2341
Fax: (613) 738-4815
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darlene A. Weekes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weekes ( CPSO# 84990 )

Business Address:
CHEO
Department of Anesthesiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARLENE ANGELE WEEKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEEKES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011