Weerasinghe, Indira Kaushalya Maithri (CPSO#: 95228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: 6139697400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. K. Weerasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Weerasinghe ( CPSO# 95228 )

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
264 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 449-8705

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 449-8705

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (613) 449-8705

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDIRA KAUSHALYA MAITHRI WEERASINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEERASINGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Dec 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2016