Weerdenburg, Kirstin Darcie (CPSO#: 96352)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kid-E-Care Pediatric Walk-In Clinic Suite 301 491 Eglinton Avenue West Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017


Address: McMaster Childrens Hospital 1200 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8W 3Z5
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017


Address: The Hospita For Sick Children 555 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017