Wegener, Stephen Peter (CPSO#: 98111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1135 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone: (226) 663-7710
Fax: (226) 663-7946
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Wegener Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wegener ( CPSO# 98111 )

Business Address:
1135 Adelaide Street North
Suite 301
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone Number: (226) 663-7710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PETER WEGENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEGENER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014