Weinstock, David Jacob (CPSO#: 70132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 1N1
Phone: (416) 221-2442
Fax: (416) 512-2022
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.J. Weinstock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weinstock ( CPSO# 70132 )

Business Address:
206 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 512-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JACOB WEINSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001