Weinstock, Victor Moss (CPSO#: 72552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
106 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Phone: (905) 209-0016
Fax: (905) 209-0017
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

206 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 1N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 221-2442
Fax: (416) 512-2022
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Moss Weinstock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Weinstock ( CPSO# 72552 )
Dr. M. Porepa ( CPSO# 81064 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
106 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 209-0016


Corporation Name: Yishai Wise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wise ( CPSO# 77844 )
Dr. V. Weinstock ( CPSO# 72552 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR MOSS WEINSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003