Weisberg, Lori Michelle (CPSO#: 81078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
5M-27
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6591
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lori Weisberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weisberg ( CPSO# 81078 )

Business Address:
305 - 124 Merton Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 5M-27
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6519

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI MICHELLE WEISBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2012

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 19, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:
If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.
The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

Lori M. WEISBERG was found guilty of operating a motor vehicle while her ability to operate a motor vehicle was impaired by alcohol contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. Dr. Weisberg was sentenced on May 19, 2016, to a one-year driving prohibition in Canada, one year probation and ordered to pay a fine of $1200, plus a victim surcharge of $360, to be paid within 12 months.