Weisel, Richard Dale (CPSO#: 30103)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Marquette University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital Division of Cardiovascular Surgery 4N-464 200 Elizabeth St Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 09 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018