Weiss, Edward Solomon (CPSO#: 98041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto West Medical
Suite 1
523 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 1J7
Phone: (416) 760-8367
Fax: (416) 760-7212
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Immunodeficiency Clinic
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 5077
Fax: 416 340 3203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD SOLOMON WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014