Weissberger, Jeff Michael (CPSO#: 72551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Physicians
377 Church Street
Suite 101
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weissberger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weissberger ( CPSO# 72551 )

Business Address:
Markham Family Physicians
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFF MICHAEL WEISSBERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISSBERGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000