Weitzner, Brenda Nicole (CPSO#: 97399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13291 Yonge St #100, Richmond Hill,
Toronto ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 1111111
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA NICOLE WEITZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEITZNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 22 Jul 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2016 to 05 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015