Weizenberg, Evan Ira (CPSO#: 93460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Weizenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weizenberg ( CPSO# 93460 )

Business Address:
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVAN IRA WEIZENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIZENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2016