Weizman, Adam Veres (CPSO#: 84211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division Of Gastroenterology
437-600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416)5864800 Ext. 1953
Fax: (416)5868689
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam V. Weizman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weizman ( CPSO# 84211 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
437 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM VERES WEIZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010