Welke, Timothy Mark (CPSO#: 78096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
Room J6100
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Ext. 6212
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Welke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Welke ( CPSO# 78096 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Suite J6100
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY MARK WELKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007