Welling, Sean Cannon (CPSO#: 96110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Medical Clinic
Unit 102B
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 894-8800
Fax: (519) 894-5540
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Welling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Welling ( CPSO# 96110 )

Business Address:
564 Belmont Avenue West
Unit 102B
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 894-8800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN CANNON WELLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013