Wells, Bryan John (CPSO#: 83003)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1621 Dufferin Crescent
Nanuimo BC  V9S 5T4
Phone: (250) 753-8808
Fax: (250) 753-8823

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015