Welsh, Melissa Elizabeth (CPSO#: 92882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
University of Guelph
J.T. Powell Building
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: 519-824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 821-2308
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health Services
University of Guelph
J.T. Powell Building
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 821-2308
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ELIZABETH WELSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012