Wendzich, Casandra (CPSO#: 95338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. M Miller's Patients
2121 Main St. W
Jarvis ON  N0A1J0
Phone: 5195875201
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. T. Mead's Patients
Lions Medical Clinic
586 Conc. # 5
Box 69
Fisherville ON  N0A1G0
Canada
Phone: 9057793436
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Dr. E. Blake's Patients
410 Lock St. W
Dunnville ON  N1A1V6
Canada
Phone: 9057016643
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Dr. Kobah,,
A. Kamouna, N, Desrocher, Reddy
D. Bernard's Patients
HWMH 206 John St
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Canada
Phone: 905-774-7541
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CASANDRA WENDZICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WENDZICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 13 Jan 2014 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015