Wesley, Jennifer (CPSO#: 95339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2015

Expiry Date:  02 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paterson Clinic
Unit 1
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 02 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jennifer  Wesley  may  practise  family  medicine  at  the following
                  locations:

                  (i)   at Peterson Medical Centre and Lake of the Woods District  Hospital
                        in Kenora, Ontario, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by
                        a supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (ii)  at  District  of Kenora Home for the Aged-Pinecrest Home Long  Term
                        Care Facility in  Kenora,  Ontario,  and Health Care - Whitedog, in
                        Whitedog,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision   coordinated  by  a
                        supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires three  years  from
                  the date  of issuance or when Dr.Wesley's eligibility to take the College
                  of Family Physicians  of  Canada  examination  expires,  whichever  comes
                  first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisors  notify  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Wesley's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, do not provide the
                        required reports to the College  by  the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisors  are  no longer able or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Wesley's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on  December  3,  2015,  and will expire on or
                  before December 2, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.