Wesley, Shannon Jean (CPSO#: 89615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Minnesota, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B6L9
Phone: (807) 285 1894
Fax: (807) 285 2094
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

First Nations Family Physicians &
Health Services
Po Box 1500
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1C2
Canada
Phone: 807 737 5191
Fax: 807 737 7176
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon J. Wesley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Branch ( CPSO# 96337 )
Dr. S. Wesley ( CPSO# 89615 )

Business Address:
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone Number: (807) 285-1894

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON JEAN WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 26 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 27 Jul 2009 to 21 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010