West, Amanda Lynne (CPSO#: 90564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Medicine
Teaching Unit
Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Fax: (905) 472-5662
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA LYNNE WEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012