West, Danielle Kirstin (CPSO#: 84278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Names: Derrington, Danielle Kirstin (used until: 31 Aug 2017 )     Derrington-Fraser, Danielle Kirstin (used until: 20 Nov 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 574-1444
Fax: (905) 575-9892
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

231 Wilson St E
Unit D
Ancaster ON  L9G2B8
Canada
Phone: 289-346-0300
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N4A6
Canada
Phone: 9055221155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle West Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. West ( CPSO# 84278 )

Business Address:
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 574-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE KIRSTIN WEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 15 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009