Westergaard, Paul (CPSO#: 96245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue Cornwall
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

109 - 705 Cotton Mill St.
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Canada
Phone: (613)-932-9494 Ext. 6
Fax: (613) 935-5955
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Westergaard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Westergaard ( CPSO# 96245 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
109-705-Cotton Mill Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone Number: (613) 732-9494

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL WESTERGAARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTERGAARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2014