Weyman, Karen Rachel (CPSO#: 60967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Feldman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Feldman ( CPSO# 59756 )
Dr. K. Weyman ( CPSO# 60967 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-7386

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN RACHEL WEYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEYMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1990