Whetter, Christine Rae (CPSO#: 73589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elizabeth Bruyere
43 Bruyere St.
Ottawa ON  K1S 5C8
Canada
Phone: 6135626262
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

TOH - General Campus
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Canada
Phone: 6138783642
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman and Whetter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Whetter ( CPSO# 73589 )
Dr. L. Norman ( CPSO# 77721 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4842

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 883-3642


Corporation Name: Christine Whetter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Whetter ( CPSO# 73589 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4842

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 878-3642

Business Address:
Elizabeth Bruyere
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Oct 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE RAE WHETTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHETTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 07 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 07 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 11 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 18 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004