White, Christine Anne (CPSO#: 73580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etherington Hall Queens University
3032
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 533-3134
Fax: (613) 533-3292
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine A. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. White ( CPSO# 73580 )

Business Address:
3048 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 533-3134

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2002 to 23 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 23 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2005