Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Effective Sept 1, 2021
RSRS
111 St Regis Cr S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
416 938 0638
Date Received: 08 Jul 2021
Instructions/Address:copy of
any scanned paper charts effective Sept 1,2021 to:
Santd Alliance Health on Hunt Club
885 Meadowlands Dr. East, Unit 15
Ottawa, ON, K2C 3N2
Tel:613.801.3380 Fax: 613.801.4380
www.AllianceHealthOHC.ca
paper charts prior to May 1, 2014
available at:
RSRS-Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S,
North York, ON, M3J1 Y6
tel: 413.938.0638
Date Received: 28 Jun 2021