White, Margaret Ann (CPSO#: 62583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Sports Medicine
1370 Clyde Ave
Ottawa, Ont K2G 3H8
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 727-2745
Fax: (613) 727-2623
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

390 March Road Suite 110
Kanata ON  K2K 0G7
Canada
Phone: 613-271-6305
Fax: 613-271-7572
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: 613-721-4712
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. White ( CPSO# 62583 )

Business Address:
Focus Assessments
Suite 150
1150 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 8S9

Business Address:
Mitel Corporation
350 Leggett Drive
Kanata ON  K2K 2W7
Phone Number: (613) 592-5660

Business Address:
Wesley Clover
390 March Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G7
Phone Number: (613) 271-6305

Business Address:
Ottawa Sport Medicine Clinic
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-2745

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991