Whitehead, Lori Nadine (CPSO#: 55807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73788
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lori N. Whitehead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Whitehead ( CPSO# 55807 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Room 1K11
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1

Business Address:
Firestone Institute of Respiratory
Health
St Joseph's Healthcare, Room T-2124
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI NADINE WHITEHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEHEAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Respiratory Disease

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1987