Whitlock, Richard Paul (CPSO#: 76394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Cardiac Vascular And
Stroke Research Institute
30 Birge St., Hamitlon ON L8L 0A6
Room C1-114
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40306
Fax: (905) 577-8017
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Whitlock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Whitlock ( CPSO# 76394 )

Business Address:
David Braley Cardiac Vascular and Stroke
Research Institue
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD PAUL WHITLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007