Whitney, Robyn Nicole (CPSO#: 92839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416 813 6660
Fax: (416) 8136709
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBYN NICOLE WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017