Whittier, Michael John (CPSO#: 52085)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Stinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stinson ( CPSO# 54444 )
Dr. M. Whittier ( CPSO# 52085 )

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Medical Records Location

Address: 72 Governors Rd E Paris, ON N3L 3E1
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018