Whittingham, Heather Anne (CPSO#: 77641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44697
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cyriac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cyriac ( CPSO# 70168 )
Dr. H. Whittingham ( CPSO# 77641 )

Business Address:
412 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-4000


Corporation Name: Whittingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Whittingham ( CPSO# 77641 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
415 - 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE WHITTINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2008