Whitty, Carolyn Jean (CPSO#: 88876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33904
Fax: 416-595-6399
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolyn Whitty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Whitty ( CPSO# 88876 )

Business Address:
1025 - 100 Stokes Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
3rd Floor Suite 3091
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN JEAN WHITTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013