Wickett, Jamie Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 81495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Phone: (519) 433-8424
Fax: (519) 433-5796
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Anne Wickett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wickett ( CPSO# 81495 )

Business Address:
Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 433-8424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE ANNE ELIZABETH WICKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006