Widjaja, Elysa (CPSO#: 82844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Oct 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 12 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Elysa Widjaja may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr. Widjaja holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Widjaja no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.