Wiebe, Dale Jason Paul (CPSO#: 92021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TrueNorth Medical Centre
24 Dalhousie Street
2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5B 2A5
Phone: (888) 878-3563
Fax: (416) 981-8939
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE JASON PAUL WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 06 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016