Wiebe, Scott Christopher (CPSO#: 79092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Div of Physical Medicine & Rehab
Room 1105C
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 75598
Fax: (613) 739-6974
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SC Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wiebe ( CPSO# 79092 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Dept of Physical Medicine & Rehab
Room 1105C
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT CHRISTOPHER WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008