Wiebe, Sheldon Peter (CPSO#: 77798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Real Time Medical
7111 Syntex Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C3
Phone: (647) 869-3294
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON PETER WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015