Wielecki, Sylvia Donna (CPSO#: 84173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kansas City Univ of Medicine & Bioscienc, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58439
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 Apr 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.   Sylvia  Donna  Wielecki  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            anaesthesia, only.