Wierstra, Benjamin Thomas (CPSO#: 89251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carelton Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Medicine
3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 403-615-3544
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN THOMAS WIERSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIERSTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018