Wierzbicki, Ola Magdalena (CPSO#: 95728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 523-7705
Fax: 9055236168
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ola Wierzbicki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Wierzbicki ( CPSO# 95728 )

Business Address:
203 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 523-7705

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLA MAGDALENA WIERZBICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIERZBICKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2016