Wilcox, Carol Lynn (CPSO#: 85479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Dennis Weston Health Centre
2050 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9X 1X4
Phone: 416 763 1171
Fax: 416 763 0573
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1276 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Canada
Phone: 905 849 8646
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

5359 Dundas Street West Suite 203
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Canada
Phone: 416 233 0333
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Finchlea Clinic
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Canada
Phone: 905 792 6500
Fax: 905 792 6853
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

91 Fifeshire Road
Toronto ON  M2L 2H2
Canada
Phone: 416 226-4113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Wilcox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wilcox ( CPSO# 85479 )

Business Address:
204 - 5359 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 233-0333

Business Address:
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 792-6500

Business Address:
1276A Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone Number: (905) 849-8646

Business Address:
2050 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X4
Phone Number: (416) 763-1171

Business Address:
90 Fifeshire Road
Toronto ON  M2L 2H2
Phone Number: (416) 226-4114

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL LYNN WILCOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILCOX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 02 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008