Wilcox, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 79124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Dept of Critical Care
399 Bathurst Street
Rm 411-M 2nd Flr McLaughlin
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6203
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilcox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilcox ( CPSO# 79124 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Critical Care
399 Bathurst Street
Room 411-M 2nd Floor McLaughlin
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6203

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH WILCOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILCOX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2007