Wildschut, Jason Anthony (CPSO#: 97478)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2012 to 23 Jul 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013