Wilejto, Marta (CPSO#: 87863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Dept of Haematology and Oncology
Black Wing Room 9412
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 227553
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTA WILEJTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILEJTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010