Wilk, Lucie Ann (CPSO#: 76964)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2001 to 26 Aug 2001
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2001