Wilkinson, Anna Natalie (CPSO#: 76240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
503 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 1C4
Phone: 613-737-8469
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Academic Family
Health Team
210 Melrose Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4334
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna N. Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilkinson ( CPSO# 76240 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 1C4
Phone Number: (613) 737-8469

Business Address:
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA NATALIE WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2004