Willer, Christopher Charles (CPSO#: 86576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Mental Health & Addictions Service
17-037, 17th Floor Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Willer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Willer ( CPSO# 86576 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing
Suite 17-037
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012