Williams, Cathy Lee (CPSO#: 89201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Rd, Manotick, ON
ON K4M 1B2
Manotick ON  K4M 1A5
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cathy Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Williams ( CPSO# 89201 )

Business Address:
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
P.O. Box 580
Manotick ON  K4M 1A5
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHY LEE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010